OK HB3393 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prisons and reformatories; directing penal institutions, detention centers and jails to use least restrictive restraints on pregnant inmates; codification; effective date.
Title
Prisons and reformatories; directing penal institutions, detention centers and jails to use least restrictive restraints on pregnant inmates; codification; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Regina Goodwin [D] | Sen. Ann Griffin [R] | Rep. Jason Dunnington [D] | Rep. Chris Kannady [R] |
Rep. Ben Loring [D] | Sen. Ron Sharp [R] | Sen. Kay Floyd [D] | Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 75 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 62 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 75 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 62 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | House | Approved by Governor 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-03 | House | Sent to Governor |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2018-05-03 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2018-05-02 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2018-05-01 | Senate | CCR read |
2018-05-01 | House | To Senate |
2018-05-01 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 14 |
2018-05-01 | House | CCR adopted |
2018-04-30 | House | Title restored |
2018-04-30 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Pittman, Sharp, Floyd |
2018-04-30 | House | CCR submitted |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Griffin, Fry, David, Shaw, Jech, Brooks, Matthews |
2018-04-25 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary |
2018-04-24 | House | SA's received |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-19 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-15 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 62 Nays: 8 |
2018-03-15 | House | Amended |
2018-03-15 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Loring, Kannady |
2018-03-15 | House | Remove Representative Loring as principal House author and substitute with Representative Goodwin |
2018-03-15 | House | Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Goodwin |
2018-03-15 | House | General Order |
2018-03-01 | House | Authored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-01 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Goodwin, Dunnington |
2018-03-01 | House | Remove Representative Goodwin as principal House author and substitute with Representative Loring |
2018-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Goodwin |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |