OK HB3379 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; alternative certification for teachers; professional education; effective date.
Title
Schools; alternative certification for teachers; professional education; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2020-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-04 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-03 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 3 |
2020-03-03 | House | General Order |
2020-02-25 | House | Authored by Senator Pemberton (principal Senate author) |
2020-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Miller |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |