OK HB3377 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; making certain acts unlawful; providing penalties; defining term; effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; making certain acts unlawful; providing penalties; defining term; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2020-03-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-05 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-04 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 19 |
2020-03-04 | House | Amended |
2020-03-04 | House | Considered |
2020-03-03 | House | Laid over |
2020-03-03 | House | General Order |
2020-02-25 | House | Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author) |
2020-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Fetgatter |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |