OK HB3366 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public health and safety; requiring certain information be included on death certificates; emergency.
Title
Public health and safety; requiring certain information be included on death certificates; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 71 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2022-03-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-21 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-15 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 13 |
2022-03-15 | House | Title stricken |
2022-03-15 | House | Amended |
2022-03-15 | House | Authored by Senator Haste (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-15 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Sean) |
2022-03-15 | House | General Order |
2022-02-16 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Roberts (Eric) |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |