OK HB3351 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - SA's received
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - SA's received
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Medical preceptorship training; providing income tax credit; revolving fund; license fee; emergency.
Title
Medical preceptorship training; providing income tax credit; revolving fund; license fee; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - Senate: Finance: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - Senate: Finance: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | SA's received |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 3 |
2024-04-23 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Withdrawn from Health and Human Services committee |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Finance Committee |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Munson |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Deck |
2024-03-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-04 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-04 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 3 |
2024-03-04 | House | General Order |
2024-02-26 | House | Emergency added |
2024-02-26 | House | Authored by Senator Thompson (Kristen) (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2024-02-19 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2024-02-12 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2024-02-12 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative McEntire |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |