OK HB3311 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Higher education; directing the State Regents for Higher Education and the Department of Career and Technology Education to prepare and publish an annual report; presentation; effective date.
Title
Higher education; directing the State Regents for Higher Education and the Department of Career and Technology Education to prepare and publish an annual report; presentation; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Cynthia Roe [R] | Sen. Darcy Jech [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 71 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2022-03-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-24 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-23 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 3 |
2022-03-23 | House | Authored by Senator Jech (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-23 | House | General Order |
2022-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2022-02-16 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Roe |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |