OK HB3306 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-01 - SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-01 - SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; left-lane driving by certain vehicles; exception; effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; left-lane driving by certain vehicles; exception; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 29 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 51 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 51 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety |
2018-04-27 | House | SA's received |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 29 Nays: 12 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-19 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-15 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 43 |
2018-03-15 | House | General Order |
2018-03-01 | House | Authored by Senator Fields (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee |
2018-02-20 | House | Referred to Public Safety |
2018-02-20 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Wright |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |