OK HB3305 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Enrolled on April 24 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 24 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Ireland Trade Commission; membership; requirements; records; duties; effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Ireland Trade Commission; membership; requirements; records; duties; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark McBride [R] | Sen. Greg McCortney [R] | Rep. Mark Lepak [R] | Rep. Forrest Bennett [D] |
Rep. Brian Hill [R] | Sen. Mary Boren [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - Senate: Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - Senate: Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Sent to Governor |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2024-04-24 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2024-04-23 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Boren |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2 |
2024-04-23 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2024-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 2 |
2024-03-06 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hill, Lepak |
2024-03-06 | House | General Order |
2024-02-28 | House | Authored by Senator McCortney (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-28 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bennett |
2024-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | Remove Representative Bennett as principal House author and substitute with Representative McBride |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Bennett |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |