OK HB3215 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Professions and occupations; Electrical License Act; requiring continuing education for renewal of certain licenses; codification; effective date.
Title
Professions and occupations; Electrical License Act; requiring continuing education for renewal of certain licenses; codification; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-30 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 67 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | House | Approved by Governor 05/03/2024 |
2024-05-01 | House | Sent to Governor |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2024-05-01 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2024-04-30 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2024-04-30 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 12 |
2024-04-30 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2024-04-18 | House | SA's received |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 4 |
2024-04-17 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2024-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-12 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 20 |
2024-03-11 | House | General Order |
2024-02-19 | House | Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-19 | House | CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative West (Kevin) |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |