OK HB3196 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 25 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 25 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Professions and occupations; Dr. Lee Denney Act of 2024; veterinary training program for rural Oklahoma; updating references; prioritizing certain students; emergency.
Title
Professions and occupations; Dr. Lee Denney Act of 2024; veterinary training program for rural Oklahoma; updating references; prioritizing certain students; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Agriculture & Rural Affairs: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House: Rural Development Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Agriculture & Rural Affairs: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House: Rural Development Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Sent to Governor |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2024-04-25 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2024-04-24 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 2 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Affairs committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Affairs |
2024-02-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-27 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-02-26 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-02-26 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2024-02-26 | House | Amended |
2024-02-26 | House | House Rule suspended |
2024-02-26 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Pederson |
2024-02-26 | House | General Order |
2024-02-15 | House | Authored by Senator Jech (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-15 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Archer |
2024-02-15 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rural Development Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rural Development |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Newton |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |