OK HB3151 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Department of Human Services; modifying contents of annual report; effective date.
Title
Department of Human Services; modifying contents of annual report; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House: Human Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House: Human Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2014-03-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-17 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-13 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Kern |
2014-03-13 | House | General Order |
2014-02-18 | House | Authored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-18 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Nollan |
2014-02-18 | House | CR; Do Pass Human Services Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Human Services |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Peterson |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |