OK HB3126 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Children; expanding duties and board representation of the Oklahoma Partnership for School Readiness Board. Effective date.
Title
Children; expanding duties and board representation of the Oklahoma Partnership for School Readiness Board. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Lee Denney [R] | Rep. Joe Dorman [D] | Sen. John Ford [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-13 - House - House: (Y: 85 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-27 | Approved by Governor 05/26/2010 | |
2010-05-21 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-21 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-05-21 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-05-20 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-20 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-20 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-13 | CCR read | |
2010-05-13 | To Senate | |
2010-05-13 | Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 9 | |
2010-05-13 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-10 | Title restored | |
2010-05-10 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-04 | HC's named: Dorman, Proctor, Buck, Coody, Miller, Sears, Cox, Jones | |
2010-04-19 | Conference granted, SCs named Ford, Coffee, Jolley, Halligan, Paddack, Eason McIntyre | |
2010-04-15 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2010-04-07 | SA's received | |
2010-04-07 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-06 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-06 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-06 | Title stricken | |
2010-04-06 | General Order, Amended | |
2010-03-23 | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-22 | Reported Do Pass Education committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Education | |
2010-03-09 | First Reading | |
2010-03-09 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-08 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 10 | |
2010-03-08 | Authored by Senator Ford (principal Senate author) | |
2010-03-08 | General Order | |
2010-02-10 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Denney | |
2010-02-10 | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Dorman | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |