OK HB3112 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-15 - Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-15 - Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Higher education; limiting payment of Oklahoma Higher Learning Access Program awards for remedial non-credit-earning courses or units; effective date.
Title
Higher education; limiting payment of Oklahoma Higher Learning Access Program awards for remedial non-credit-earning courses or units; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-07 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 55 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 67 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Education: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 67 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Education: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee | |
2012-03-08 | First Reading | |
2012-03-08 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-07 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-07 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 20; Ayes: 55 Nays: 27 | |
2012-03-07 | Amended | |
2012-03-07 | General Order | |
2012-02-23 | Authored by Senator Brecheen (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-23 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Hickman | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |