OK HB3085 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; taxable income; itemized deductions; gambling deduction.
Title
Revenue and taxation; taxable income; itemized deductions; gambling deduction.
Sponsors
Rep. Kyle Hilbert [R] | Sen. Brent Howard [R] | Rep. Dustin Roberts [R] | Rep. John Pfeiffer [R] |
Rep. Kevin Wallace [R] | Rep. Scott Fetgatter [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 51 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2022-03-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-15 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 31; Ayes: 51 Nays: 31 |
2022-03-14 | House | Authored by Senator Howard (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-14 | House | General Order |
2022-03-02 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Wallace, Roberts (Dustin), Pfeiffer, Fetgatter |
2022-03-02 | House | Title stricken |
2022-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Hilbert |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |