OK HB3031 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
Pending: Senate Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
Pending: Senate Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Agriculture; Scrap Metal Dealers Act; definitions; records; sales and purchase; effective date.
Title
Agriculture; Scrap Metal Dealers Act; definitions; records; sales and purchase; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Carol Bush [R] | Rep. Elise Hall [R] | Rep. Nicole Miller [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2020-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-04 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-03 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 0 |
2020-03-03 | House | General Order |
2020-02-19 | House | Authored by Senator Hall (principal Senate author) |
2020-02-19 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Miller |
2020-02-19 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Rural Development Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Rural Development |
2020-02-06 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Bush |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |