OK HB3028 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-8)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-8)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Energy; creating the Oklahoma Energy Security Act. Effective date.
Title
Energy; creating the Oklahoma Energy Security Act. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-17 - House - House: (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: Energy & Utility Regulation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: Energy & Utility Regulation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-27 | Approved by Governor 05/26/2010 | |
2010-05-21 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-21 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-05-21 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-05-20 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-20 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-20 | coauthored by Johnson (Constance) | |
2010-05-20 | 2 CCR adopted | |
2010-05-17 | 2 CCR read | |
2010-05-17 | To Senate | |
2010-05-17 | Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 2 | |
2010-05-17 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roan, Dorman, Williams | |
2010-05-17 | 2 CCR adopted | |
2010-05-12 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Brown | |
2010-05-12 | 2 CCR submitted | |
2010-05-12 | Further conference granted, same conferees | |
2010-05-11 | CCR rejected, further conference requested, same conferees | |
2010-05-04 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-03 | HC's named: Benge, Thompson, Watson, Jackson, Scott, Brown, Steele | |
2010-05-03 | Conference granted, SCs named Myers, Bingman, Branan, Ivester, Rice | |
2010-04-29 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2010-04-08 | SA's received | |
2010-04-08 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-07 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-07 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-07 | coauthored by Corn, Garrison, Schulz | |
2010-04-07 | General Order, Amended | |
2010-03-29 | coauthored by Morgan | |
2010-03-29 | coauthored by Branan, Gumm, Ivester, Rice | |
2010-03-29 | Title restored | |
2010-03-29 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy and Environment committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-25 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy and Environment committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-16 | Pending coauthorship Senator(s) Branan | |
2010-03-09 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Morgan | |
2010-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Energy and Environment | |
2010-03-03 | Pending coauthorship Senator(s) Branan | |
2010-03-03 | First Reading | |
2010-03-03 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-02 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-02 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 3 | |
2010-03-02 | Title stricken | |
2010-03-02 | Amended | |
2010-03-02 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Jett, Luttrell, Buck, Morrissette, Scott, Walker | |
2010-03-02 | General Order | |
2010-02-17 | Authored by Senator Myers (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-17 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Wesselhoft, Blackwell | |
2010-02-17 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy and Utility Regulation Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Energy and Utility Regulation | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Benge | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 287 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
17 | 801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
17 | 801 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 801 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 801 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 801 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 801 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 801 | 6 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 801 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 802 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
17 | 803 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
17 | 804 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 78f | Amended Code | See Bill Text |