OK HB3016 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-16 - Veto overrride failed: Ayes: 55 Nays: 38
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-16 - Veto overrride failed: Ayes: 55 Nays: 38
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Parental rights; creating the Parental Rights Immunization Act; effective date.
Title
Parental rights; creating the Parental Rights Immunization Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Randon Grau [R] | Sen. Nathan Dahm [R] | Rep. Jason Murphey [R] | Rep. Mike Ritze [R] |
Rep. Sean Roberts [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-16 - House - House: O EMERGENCY (Y: 55 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Senate: AMENDMENT (Y: 15 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Table Amendment (Y: 15 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2016-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Senate: AMENDMENT (Y: 15 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Table Amendment (Y: 15 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2016-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-16 | House | Veto overrride failed: Ayes: 55 Nays: 38 |
2016-05-02 | House | Vetoed 04/29/2016 |
2016-04-25 | House | Sent to Governor |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2016-04-25 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2016-04-21 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 6 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Title restored |
2016-04-21 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2016-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 6 |
2016-03-09 | House | Amended |
2016-03-09 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ritze, Roberts (Sean), Murphey |
2016-03-09 | House | General Order |
2016-02-17 | House | Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author) |
2016-02-17 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2016-02-10 | House | Withdrawn from Children, Youth and Family Services Committee |
2016-02-08 | House | Referred to Children, Youth and Family Services |
2016-02-08 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Grau |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |