OK HB2996 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sunset; Capitol-Medical Center Improvement and Zoning Commission; re-creating Commission; modifying termination date.
Title
Sunset; Capitol-Medical Center Improvement and Zoning Commission; re-creating Commission; modifying termination date.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Gann [R] | Sen. Julie Daniels [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Rules: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Administrative Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Rules: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Administrative Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | House | Approved by Governor 04/28/2022 |
2022-04-26 | House | Sent to Governor |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2022-04-26 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2022-04-25 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 9 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2022-03-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-24 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-23 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 17 |
2022-03-23 | House | Amended |
2022-03-23 | House | Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-23 | House | General Order |
2022-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass Administrative Rules Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Gann |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |