OK HB2987 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Physician Manpower Training Commission; expanding eligibility of program to physician assistants; effective date.
Title
Physician Manpower Training Commission; expanding eligibility of program to physician assistants; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 40 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 65 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 65 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | House | Approved by Governor 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-03 | House | Sent to Governor |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2018-05-03 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2018-05-03 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 40 Nays: 3 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2018-05-02 | Senate | CCR read |
2018-05-02 | House | To Senate |
2018-05-02 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 65 Nays: 9 |
2018-05-02 | House | CCR adopted |
2018-05-01 | House | Title restored |
2018-05-01 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Pittman |
2018-05-01 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cockroft |
2018-05-01 | House | CCR submitted |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Conference granted, GCCA |
2018-04-25 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Health Services and Long-Term Care |
2018-04-16 | House | SA's received |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 3 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2018-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 10 |
2018-03-06 | House | Authored by Senator Yen (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-06 | House | General Order |
2018-02-07 | House | CR; Do Pass Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Health Services and Long-Term Care |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative McEntire |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 1 | 2721 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 2723 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 625 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 625 | 4a | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 625 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 697 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 697 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 697 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 697 | 21a | Amended Code | See Bill Text |