OK HB2969 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-05 - Approved by Governor 04/02/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-05 - Approved by Governor 04/02/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Motor vehicles; relating to lights on vehicles; specifying which vehicles may display certain lights; directing wrecker and tow service operators to provide certain information to law enforcement agencies subsequent to vehicle repossession. Effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; relating to lights on vehicles; specifying which vehicles may display certain lights; directing wrecker and tow service operators to provide certain information to law enforcement agencies subsequent to vehicle repossession. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Rex Duncan [R] | Sen. Ron Justice [R] | Rep. Mike Sanders [R] | Rep. Sue Tibbs [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-05 | Approved by Governor 04/02/2010 | |
2010-03-31 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-03-31 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-03-31 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-30 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-03-30 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-03-30 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-30 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-03-17 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety and Homeland Security committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-16 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety and Homeland Security committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety and Homeland Security | |
2010-03-04 | First Reading | |
2010-03-04 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-03 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-03 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-03 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Duncan, Tibbs | |
2010-03-03 | General Order | |
2010-02-25 | Authored by Senator Justice (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-25 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Sanders | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 11 | 314 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 11 | 405 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 12 | 218 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 12 | 227 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 12 | 229 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 954A | New Code | See Bill Text | |
47 | 965 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |