OK HB2898 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prisons and reformatories; abolishing the Canteen System Board; effective date.
Title
Prisons and reformatories; abolishing the Canteen System Board; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2020-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 |
2020-03-10 | House | Title stricken |
2020-03-10 | House | Amended |
2020-03-10 | House | General Order |
2020-02-17 | House | Authored by Senator Boggs (principal Senate author) |
2020-02-17 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Humphrey |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |