OK HB2890 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-28 - CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-28 - CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
State government; Oklahoma Personnel Act; modifying certain personnel in classified service; effective date; emergency.
Title
State government; Oklahoma Personnel Act; modifying certain personnel in classified service; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Health & Social Services: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Health & Social Services: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-28 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Pittman, Dorman | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |