OK HB2884 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2884
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-28 - Becomes law without Governor's signature 03/28/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-28 - Becomes law without Governor's signature 03/28/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Department of Human Services; making appropriations; purposes; special accounts; joint committee; emergency.
Title
Department of Human Services; making appropriations; purposes; special accounts; joint committee; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations And Budget: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations And Budget House Bill: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations And Budget: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations And Budget House Bill: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-28 | House | Becomes law without Governor's signature 03/28/2023 |
2023-03-21 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2023-03-21 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2023-03-21 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 3 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | JCR adopted |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2023-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-03-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 5 |
2023-03-14 | House | JCR adopted |
2023-03-14 | House | General Order |
2023-03-13 | House | Emergency added |
2023-03-13 | House | JCR; Do pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2023-02-21 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2023-02-21 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2023-02-06 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Hall |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Senator Thompson (Roger) (principal Senate author) |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Wallace, Martinez |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2884 (Carry Over) 2023-03-28 - Becomes law without Governor's signature 03/28/2023