OK HB2846 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2846
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-28 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-28 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Broadband; public entities and providing of information by Internet service providers; penalty for failure to timely submit certain information; effective date.
Title
Broadband; public entities and providing of information by Internet service providers; penalty for failure to timely submit certain information; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-28 - House - House: Government Modernization and: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization and Technology Committee |
2023-02-20 | House | Referred to Government Modernization and Technology |
2023-02-20 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Caldwell (Trey) |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2846 (Carry Over) 2023-02-28 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization and Technology Committee