OK HB2811 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
Pending: Senate Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
Pending: Senate Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Consumer credit; Department of Consumer Credit; modifying requirement for certain advisory committee member appointment; effective date.
Title
Consumer credit; Department of Consumer Credit; modifying requirement for certain advisory committee member appointment; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Judd Strom [R] | Sen. Bill Coleman [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2020-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-04 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-03 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 7 |
2020-03-03 | House | Authored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-03 | House | General Order |
2020-02-13 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Strom |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |