OK HB2803 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-02 - Conference granted, GCCA
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-02 - Conference granted, GCCA
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Medicaid Program; certain health care benefit waivers; qualifications. Effective date.
Title
Medicaid Program; certain health care benefit waivers; qualifications. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. David Derby [R] | Sen. Ann Griffin [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Senate | Conference granted, GCCA |
2016-04-26 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA |
2016-04-25 | House | SA's received |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2016-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-03-08 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-08 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 6 |
2016-03-08 | House | Authored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author) |
2016-03-08 | House | General Order |
2016-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2016-02-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2016-02-22 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Derby |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
56 | 1010 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
56 | 1011 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |