OK HB2777 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-19 - CCR read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-19 - CCR read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Game and fish; Wildlife Diversity Fund; reauthorizing income tax checkoff; effective date.
Title
Game and fish; Wildlife Diversity Fund; reauthorizing income tax checkoff; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-19 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 88 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | Senate | CCR read |
2016-05-19 | House | To Senate |
2016-05-19 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 5 |
2016-05-19 | House | CCR adopted |
2016-05-18 | House | Title restored |
2016-05-18 | House | CCR submitted |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Brecheen, Mazzei, Marlatt, Dahm, Silk, Wyrick, Paddack |
2016-05-04 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA |
2016-04-18 | House | SA's received |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 2 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2016-03-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-03-02 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-03-01 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-01 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 6 |
2016-03-01 | House | Authored by Senator Brecheen (principal Senate author) |
2016-03-01 | House | General Order |
2016-02-24 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2016-02-16 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |