OK HB2738 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2738
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-04 - Coauthored by Senator Hamilton
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-04 - Coauthored by Senator Hamilton
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Elections; canvassing of returns; providing for continuous tabulation; effective date.
Title
Elections; canvassing of returns; providing for continuous tabulation; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Collin Duel [R] | Sen. Julie Daniels [R] | Rep. Denise Hader [R] | Rep. Eric Roberts [R] |
Sen. Warren Hamilton [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - House - House: Elections and Ethics Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - House - House: Elections and Ethics Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Hamilton |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Roberts |
2023-03-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-21 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-03-20 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 18 |
2023-03-20 | House | Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author) |
2023-03-20 | House | General Order |
2023-02-22 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) CrosswhiteHader |
2023-02-22 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Elections and Ethics Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Elections and Ethics |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Duel |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2738 (Carry Over) 2023-04-04 - Coauthored by Senator Hamilton