OK HB2738 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Corporation Commission; authorizing Commission to investigate and modify or reject Special Universal Services request; effective date.
Title
Corporation Commission; authorizing Commission to investigate and modify or reject Special Universal Services request; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Johnson [R] | Rep. Ron Peters [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: Energy & Utility Regulation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: Energy & Utility Regulation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-25 | Approved by Governor 04/25/2012 | |
2012-04-19 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-19 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-19 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-18 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-18 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-19 | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 2 | |
2012-04-18 | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version | |
2012-04-18 | Title restored | |
2012-04-18 | General Order, Amended | |
2012-04-18 | Senate Rule suspended | |
2012-03-29 | Title stricken | |
2012-03-29 | Reported Do Pass as amended Energy committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Energy | |
2012-02-29 | First Reading | |
2012-02-29 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-02-28 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-02-28 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 2 | |
2012-02-28 | General Order | |
2012-02-15 | Authored by Senator Johnson (Rob) (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-15 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy and Utility Regulation Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Energy and Utility Regulation | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Peters | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |