OK HB2715 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-18 - Approved by Governor 04/18/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-18 - Approved by Governor 04/18/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Service warranties; modifying information required on certain service contracts; effective date.
Title
Service warranties; modifying information required on certain service contracts; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Economic Development, Commerce and: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Economic Development, Commerce and: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-18 | House | Approved by Governor 04/18/2016 |
2016-04-12 | House | Sent to Governor |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2016-04-12 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2016-04-11 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 3 |
2016-04-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-04-07 | Senate | coauthored by McDaniel (Randy) |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Insurance committee; CR filed |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2016-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-03-08 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-08 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 1 |
2016-03-08 | House | Authored by Senator Quinn (principal Senate author) |
2016-03-08 | House | General Order |
2016-02-24 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Economic Development, Commerce and Real Estate Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Economic Development, Commerce and Real Estate |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Ortega |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 141 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 141 | 26 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 141 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 141 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 141 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |