OK HB2704 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-15 - Second Reading referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-15 - Second Reading referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; Oklahoma Quality Jobs Program Act; federal contractors; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; Oklahoma Quality Jobs Program Act; federal contractors; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-06 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 45 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE TITLE (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Revenue & Taxation: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE TITLE (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE TITLE (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Revenue & Taxation: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE TITLE (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Finance | |
2012-03-12 | First Reading | |
2012-03-12 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-08 | Motion expired | |
2012-03-06 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Vaughan | |
2012-03-06 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 17; Ayes: 45 Nays: 43 | |
2012-03-06 | General Order | |
2012-02-23 | Title stricken | |
2012-02-23 | Authored by Senator Fields (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-23 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman | |
2012-02-23 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Vaughan | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |