OK HB2679 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-08 - Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-08 - Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Higher education; modifying award amount for eligible Oklahoma Higher Learning Access Program students; effective date.
Title
Higher education; modifying award amount for eligible Oklahoma Higher Learning Access Program students; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Banz [R] | Rep. Ann Coody [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Hickman [R] | Sen. Clark Jolley [R] |
Rep. Sally Kern [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-05 - House - House: RECONSIDER MEASURE (Y: 57 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 48 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Education: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 48 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Education: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee | |
2012-03-06 | First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-05 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-05 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 54 Nays: 36 | |
2012-03-05 | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 57 Nays: 20 | |
2012-03-01 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Banz | |
2012-03-01 | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 48 Nays: 36 | |
2012-03-01 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hickman, Coody | |
2012-03-01 | General Order | |
2012-02-23 | Authored by Senator Jolley (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-23 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Kern | |
2012-02-23 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Banz | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |