OK HB2666 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2666
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Approved by Governor 04/27/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Approved by Governor 04/27/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; modifying elements of certain prohibited act; effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; modifying elements of certain prohibited act; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: Judiciary-Criminal Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: Judiciary-Criminal Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | House | Approved by Governor 04/27/2021 |
2021-04-22 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-22 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-04 | Senate | coauthored by Bell |
2021-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-04 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-03 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-03 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0 |
2021-03-03 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roe |
2021-03-03 | House | General Order |
2021-02-25 | House | Authored by Senator Garvin (principal Senate author) |
2021-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-02-09 | House | Referred to Judiciary - Criminal |
2021-02-09 | House | Withdrawn from Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2021-02-08 | House | Withdrawn from Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Echols |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2666 (Carry Over) 2021-04-27 - Approved by Governor 04/27/2021