OK HB2645 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2645
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/13/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/13/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Firearms; unlawful carry in certain places; prohibiting carry on certain government property; clarifying certain exemption; emergency.
Title
Firearms; unlawful carry in certain places; prohibiting carry on certain government property; clarifying certain exemption; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 19 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2021-02-25 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 19 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2021-02-25 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | House | Approved by Governor 05/13/2021 |
2021-05-12 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2021-05-12 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2021-05-11 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2021-05-11 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 3 |
2021-05-11 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2021-04-26 | House | SA's received |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2021-03-10 | Senate | coauthored by Newton |
2021-03-10 | Senate | coauthored by Bashore |
2021-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 19 |
2021-03-09 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2021-03-09 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Murdock, Bullard, Hamilton, Stephens |
2021-03-09 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Steagall, CrosswhiteHader |
2021-03-09 | House | General Order |
2021-03-01 | House | Emergency added |
2021-03-01 | House | Authored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author) |
2021-03-01 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis, Roberts (Sean), West (Kevin), Hardin (David), McDugle |
2021-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2021-02-08 | House | Withdrawn from Public Safety Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Echols |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2645 (Carry Over) 2021-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/13/2021