OK HB2635 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2635
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; tax credits; purchase procedures; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; tax credits; purchase procedures; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Withdrawn from Finance committee |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2019-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-12 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 2 |
2019-03-11 | House | General Order |
2019-02-20 | House | Authored by Senator Thompson (principal Senate author) |
2019-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Business and Commerce |
2019-02-06 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Echols |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2635 (Carry Over) 2019-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations