OK HB2625 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2625
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - SA's received
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - SA's received
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; certification of principals and superintendents; removing examination requirement; alternative certification; effective date; emergency.
Title
Schools; certification of principals and superintendents; removing examination requirement; alternative certification; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Echols [R] | Sen. Kim David [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 31 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | SA's received |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Emergency passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 11 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 12 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-04-24 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2019-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 5 |
2019-03-13 | House | Title stricken |
2019-03-13 | House | Amended |
2019-03-13 | House | Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-13 | House | General Order |
2019-02-26 | House | Emergency added |
2019-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Common Education |
2019-02-13 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Echols |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2625 (Carry Over) 2019-04-25 - SA's received