OK HB2587 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-07 - Approved by Governor 05/04/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-07 - Approved by Governor 05/04/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public health and safety; Oklahoma Dental Loan Repayment Program; effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; Oklahoma Dental Loan Repayment Program; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-07 | Approved by Governor 05/04/2012 | |
2012-04-30 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-30 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-26 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-25 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-25 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-25 | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-25 | coauthored by Garrison | |
2012-04-25 | Title restored | |
2012-04-25 | General Order, Amended | |
2012-04-25 | Senate Rule suspended | |
2012-04-09 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-27 | Referred to Appropriations | |
2012-03-27 | Title stricken | |
2012-03-27 | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee | |
2012-02-21 | First Reading | |
2012-02-21 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-02-20 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-02-20 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 1 | |
2012-02-20 | General Order | |
2012-02-15 | Authored by Senator Shortey (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-15 | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Joyner | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |