OK HB2495 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-18 - Authored by Senator Fry (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-18 - Authored by Senator Fry (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Foster care; permitting youth to receive extended foster care services from the Department of Human Services; effective date.
Title
Foster care; permitting youth to receive extended foster care services from the Department of Human Services; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Banz [R] | Sen. Jack Fry [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-18 | House | Authored by Senator Fry (principal Senate author) |
2016-02-18 | House | Title stricken |
2016-02-18 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2016-02-08 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee sub-committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Banz |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |