OK HB2495 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Game and fish; permitting release of unclaimed venison after certain period of time has elapsed; effective date.
Title
Game and fish; permitting release of unclaimed venison after certain period of time has elapsed; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Agriculture, Wildlife & Environment Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Agriculture, Wildlife & Environment Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-25 | Approved by Governor 04/25/2012 | |
2012-04-19 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-19 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-19 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-18 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-18 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-18 | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-18 | Title restored | |
2012-04-18 | General Order, Amended | |
2012-04-18 | Senate Rule suspended | |
2012-04-03 | Title stricken | |
2012-04-03 | Reported Do Pass as amended Agriculture and Rural Development committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development | |
2012-03-08 | First Reading | |
2012-03-08 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-07 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-07 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-07 | Authored by Senator Brecheen (principal Senate author) | |
2012-03-07 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Dustin) | |
2012-03-07 | General Order | |
2012-03-01 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Hardin | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |