OK HB2476 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/30/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Environment and natural resources; Oklahoma Pollutant Discharge Elimination System Act; providing exemption to certain entities; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environment and natural resources; Oklahoma Pollutant Discharge Elimination System Act; providing exemption to certain entities; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseApproved by Governor 04/30/2019
2019-04-24HouseSent to Governor
2019-04-24SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-04-24HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-04-23HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-04-23SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2019-04-23SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 7
2019-04-23SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-04-04SenateReported Do Pass Energy committee; CR filed
2019-03-25SenateSecond Reading referred to Energy
2019-03-12SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-12HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-11HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-11HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 17
2019-03-11HouseGeneral Order
2019-03-04HouseAuthored by Senator Hall (principal Senate author)
2019-03-04HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce Committee
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Business and Commerce
2019-02-06HouseWithdrawn from Utilities Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Utilities
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative McCall
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback