OK HB2474 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Water; Oklahoma Water Resources Board procedures; directing all applications be disclosed on a website; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Water; Oklahoma Water Resources Board procedures; directing all applications be disclosed on a website; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-09 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Government Efficiency Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HouseApproved by Governor 05/16/2019
2019-05-13HouseSent to Governor
2019-05-13SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-05-13HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-05-09HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-05-09HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
2019-05-09HouseSA's read, adopted
2019-04-25HouseSA's received
2019-04-25SenateEngrossed to House
2019-04-24SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-04-24SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
2019-04-24SenateTitle restored
2019-04-24SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2019-04-22SenateCoauthored by Senator McCortney
2019-04-04SenateTitle stricken
2019-04-04SenateReported Do Pass as amended Energy committee; CR filed
2019-04-01SenateCoauthored by Senator Treat
2019-04-01SenateRemove as author Senator Treat; authored by Senator Simpson
2019-03-25SenateSecond Reading referred to Energy
2019-03-11SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-11HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-07HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-07HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 3
2019-03-07HouseAuthored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author)
2019-03-07HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-06HouseCR; Do Pass Government Efficiency Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Government Efficiency
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative McCall
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2474&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/hB/HB2474%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/HB2474%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/hB/HB2474%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/HB2474%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB2474%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/hB/HB2474%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2474_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2474_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback