OK HB2471 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/13/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Mines and mining; declaring moratorium on issuance of certain permits and amendments or revisions to permits; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mines and mining; declaring moratorium on issuance of certain permits and amendments or revisions to permits; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-06 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House: Utilities Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseApproved by Governor 05/13/2019
2019-05-07HouseSent to Governor
2019-05-07SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-05-07HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-05-06HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-05-06HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
2019-05-06HouseSA's read, adopted
2019-04-24HouseSA's received
2019-04-24SenateEngrossed to House
2019-04-23SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-04-23SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 6
2019-04-23SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2019-04-08Senatecoauthored by Townley
2019-04-04SenateCoauthored by Senator Simpson
2019-04-04SenateCoauthored by Senator Bullard
2019-04-04SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy committee; CR filed
2019-04-04SenateCoauthored by Senator Kidd
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading referred to Energy
2019-03-14SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-14HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-13HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-13HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 1
2019-03-13HouseAmended
2019-03-13HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Dustin)
2019-03-13HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-28HouseAuthored by Senator McCortney (principal Senate author)
2019-02-28HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Branham, Johns
2019-02-28HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Utilities Committee
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Utilities
2019-02-13HouseWithdrawn from Rules Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative McCall
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2471&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/hB/HB2471%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB2471%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/HB2471%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/hB/HB2471%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCSH/HB2471%20SCSH.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/HB2471%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB2471%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/hB/HB2471%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2471_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2471_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback