OK HB2468 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2468
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/23/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/23/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Children; creating the Oklahoma Gestational Agreement Act; emergency.
Title
Children; creating the Oklahoma Gestational Agreement Act; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 33 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 84 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 84 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | House | Approved by Governor 05/23/2019 |
2019-05-20 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-05-20 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-05-17 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Emergency passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 8 |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 33 Nays: 10 |
2019-05-17 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Remove as coauthor Senator Standridge |
2019-05-15 | Senate | CCR read |
2019-05-15 | House | To Senate |
2019-05-15 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 6 |
2019-05-15 | House | CCR adopted |
2019-05-14 | House | CCR submitted |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Howard, Daniels, Leewright, Sharp, Boren, Brooks |
2019-05-06 | House | HC's changed: Withdrawn from Conference Committee on Judiciary and naming Conference Committee on Rules |
2019-05-02 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary |
2019-04-24 | House | SA's received |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Emergency added |
2019-04-23 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Standridge |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Brooks |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-12 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 29 |
2019-03-11 | House | General Order |
2019-02-20 | House | Authored by Senator Howard (principal Senate author) |
2019-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-12 | House | Referred to Judiciary |
2019-02-12 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Dunnington |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2468 (Carry Over) 2019-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/23/2019