OK HB2468 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Referred for enrollment
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Children; creating the Oklahoma Gestational Agreement Act; codification; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Children; creating the Oklahoma Gestational Agreement Act; codification; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 33 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 84 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-05-17SenateEmergency passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 8
2019-05-17SenateMeasure passed, to House: Ayes: 33 Nays: 10
2019-05-17SenateCCR adopted
2019-05-17SenateRemove as coauthor Senator Standridge
2019-05-15SenateCCR read
2019-05-15HouseTo Senate
2019-05-15HouseFourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 6
2019-05-15HouseCCR adopted
2019-05-14HouseCCR submitted
2019-05-07SenateConference granted, SCs named Howard, Daniels, Leewright, Sharp, Boren, Brooks
2019-05-06HouseHC's changed: Withdrawn from Conference Committee on Judiciary and naming Conference Committee on Rules
2019-05-02HouseSA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary
2019-04-24HouseSA's received
2019-04-24SenateEngrossed to House
2019-04-23SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-04-23SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2019-04-23SenateEmergency clause restored
2019-04-23SenateTitle restored
2019-04-23SenateEmergency clause stricken
2019-04-23SenateEmergency added
2019-04-23SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2019-04-22SenateCoauthored by Senator Standridge
2019-04-22SenateCoauthored by Senator Brooks
2019-04-09SenateTitle stricken
2019-04-09SenateReported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
2019-03-25SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2019-03-12SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-12HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-11HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-11HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 29
2019-03-11HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-20HouseAuthored by Senator Howard (principal Senate author)
2019-02-20HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee
2019-02-12HouseReferred to Judiciary
2019-02-12HouseWithdrawn from Rules Committee
2019-02-06HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Dunnington
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2468&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/hB/HB2468%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB2468%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/HB2468%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/hB/HB2468%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/HB2468%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB2468%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCCS/HB2468%20CCS.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2468_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2468_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback