OK HB2441 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Abortion; prohibiting the performance of an abortion without first determining whether there is a detectable fetal heartbeat; exception; penalty; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abortion; prohibiting the performance of an abortion without first determining whether there is a detectable fetal heartbeat; exception; penalty; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: States Rights Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-26HouseApproved by Governor 04/26/2021
2021-04-21HouseSent to Governor
2021-04-21SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2021-04-21HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2021-04-20HouseReferred for enrollment
2021-04-20SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2021-04-20SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 10
2021-04-20SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2021-04-20SenateCoauthored by Senator Jett
2021-04-20SenateCoauthored by Senator Rogers
2021-04-19SenateCoauthored by Senator Stephens
2021-04-08SenateCoauthored by Senator Bergstrom
2021-04-07SenateReported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
2021-03-29SenateReferred to Appropriations
2021-03-29SenateReported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2021-03-17SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2021-03-15SenateCoauthored by Representative Kendrix
2021-03-10SenateFirst Reading
2021-03-10HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2021-03-09HouseReferred for engrossment
2021-03-09HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 19
2021-03-09HouseAmended by floor substitute
2021-03-09HouseAuthored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author)
2021-03-09HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Conley, Townley, Grego, Boles, Fetgatter, Lepak, Stark, Gann, Dills, Steagall, McDugle, Roe
2021-03-09HouseGeneral Order
2021-02-24HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) CrosswhiteHader, Smith, Stearman, Olsen, West (Kevin), Burns
2021-02-24HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute States Rights Committee
2021-02-22HouseReferred to States Rights
2021-02-22HouseWithdrawn from Rules Committee
2021-02-02HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2021-02-01HouseAuthored by Representative Russ
2021-02-01HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2441&Session=2100
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/hB/HB2441%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB2441%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/HFLR/HB2441%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/hB/HB2441%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/SFLR/HB2441%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENR/hB/HB2441%20ENR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB2441%20FULLPCS1%20TODD%20RUSS-AB.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB2441%20FA1%20RUSSTO-AB.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2441%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2441%20FULLPCS1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2441%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2441%20FA1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/HB2441%20ENGR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/impact%20statements/fiscal/Senate/HB2441%20ENGR%20FI.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2441_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2441_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback