OK HB2441 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2441
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Abortion; prohibiting the performance of an abortion without first determining whether there is a detectable fetal heartbeat; exception; penalty; effective date.
Title
Abortion; prohibiting the performance of an abortion without first determining whether there is a detectable fetal heartbeat; exception; penalty; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Russ [R] | Sen. Julie Daniels [R] | Rep. Mark Lepak [R] | Rep. Scott Fetgatter [R] |
Rep. Tom Gann [R] | Rep. Kevin McDugle [R] | Rep. Sherrie Conley [R] | Rep. Sheila Dills [R] |
Rep. Jim Olsen [R] | Rep. David Smith [R] | Rep. Jay Steagall [R] | Rep. Brad Boles [R] |
Rep. Wendi Stearman [R] | Rep. Gerrid Kendrix [R] | Rep. Tammy Townley [R] | Rep. Marilyn Stark [R] |
Rep. Cynthia Roe [R] | Rep. Jim Grego [R] | Rep. Denise Hader [R] | Rep. Ty Burns [R] |
Rep. Kevin West [R] | Sen. Micheal Bergstrom [R] | Sen. Shane Jett [R] | Sen. Cody Rogers [R] |
Sen. Blake Stephens [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: States Rights Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: States Rights Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | House | Approved by Governor 04/26/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-21 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2021-04-20 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Rogers |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Jett |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 10 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Stephens |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Kendrix |
2021-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 19 |
2021-03-09 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2021-03-09 | House | Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author) |
2021-03-09 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Conley, Townley, Grego, Boles, Fetgatter, Lepak, Stark, Gann, Dills, Steagall, McDugle, Roe |
2021-03-09 | House | General Order |
2021-02-24 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) CrosswhiteHader, Smith, Stearman, Olsen, West (Kevin), Burns |
2021-02-24 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute States Rights Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to States Rights |
2021-02-22 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Russ |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2441 (Carry Over) 2021-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2021