OK HB2403 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Revenue and taxation; computation of adjusted gross income and taxable income; limit on amount of itemized deductions; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revenue and taxation; computation of adjusted gross income and taxable income; limit on amount of itemized deductions; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 56 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23SenateDirect to Calendar
2017-05-22SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-22HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2017-05-22HouseReferred for engrossment
2017-05-22HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 56 Nays: 40
2017-05-22HouseJCR adopted
2017-05-22HouseGeneral Order
2017-05-15HouseJCR; Do pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
2017-05-09HouseSecond Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
2017-05-08HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Fields
2017-05-08HouseAuthored by Senator David (principal Senate author)
2017-05-08HouseAuthored by Representative Osborn (Leslie), Wallace
2017-05-08HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback