OK HB2389 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-08 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-08 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
State government; modifying certain provisions relating to unclassified service; effective date.
Title
State government; modifying certain provisions relating to unclassified service; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2012-03-05 | First Reading | |
2012-03-05 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-01 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-01 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 17 | |
2012-03-01 | General Order | |
2012-02-23 | Authored by Senator Marlatt (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-23 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Liebmann | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |