OK HB2380 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2380
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic beverages; licensee prohibited acts; patron self-pour service; effective date.
Title
Alcoholic beverages; licensee prohibited acts; patron self-pour service; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 69 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 69 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | House | Approved by Governor 04/23/2021 |
2021-04-20 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-20 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2021-04-19 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 10 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2021-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 27 |
2021-03-09 | House | Authored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author) |
2021-03-09 | House | General Order |
2021-02-22 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis |
2021-02-22 | House | Remove Representative Davis as principal House author and substitute with Representative Marti |
2021-02-22 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Davis |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2380 (Carry Over) 2021-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2021