OK HB2372 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Revenue and taxation; imposing additional tax levy upon cigarettes; providing apportionment of revenues to certain funds; creating funds; excise tax stamps.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revenue and taxation; imposing additional tax levy upon cigarettes; providing apportionment of revenues to certain funds; creating funds; excise tax stamps.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 63 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18SenateDirect to Calendar
2017-05-17SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-17HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2017-05-17HouseReferred for engrossment
2017-05-17HouseMotion expired
2017-05-15HouseNotice served to reconsider vote by Representative Osborn (Leslie)
2017-05-15HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 63 Nays: 34
2017-05-15HouseJCR adopted
2017-05-15HouseGeneral Order
2017-05-08HouseJCR; Do pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
2017-04-24HouseSecond Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
2017-04-20HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Fields
2017-04-20HouseAuthored by Senator David (principal Senate author)
2017-04-20HouseAuthored by Representative Osborn (Leslie), Wallace
2017-04-20HouseFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
683027Amended CodeSee Bill Text
683027aAmended CodeSee Bill Text
683027bAmended CodeSee Bill Text
683027cAmended CodeSee Bill Text
683027dAmended CodeSee Bill Text
683027eAmended CodeSee Bill Text
683027fAmended CodeSee Bill Text
683027gAmended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback